This case was last updated from Le Flore County Courts on 04/12/2022 at 13:17:25 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: ROBERT SAMUEL WARD, ET. AL., CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 THE APPLICATION OF ROBERT SAMUEL WARD, , CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Le Flore County Courts, Le Flore County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is SULLIVAN, JONATHAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0151

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Le Flore, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

SULLIVAN, JONATHAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WARD, ROBERT SAMUEL

WILLIAMS, ROBERT J.

Defendants

LEFLORE, MARY

LEFLORE, MACK H.

HEIRS OF MARY LEFLORE

HEIRS OF MACK H. LEFLORE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WALKER, DANIEL

201 S Wheeler Ave

Sallisaw, OK 74955

 

Court Documents

FILE & ENTER PETITION

08/18/2021: FILE & ENTER PETITION

FILE AFFIDAVIT TO OBTAIN SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

08/18/2021: FILE AFFIDAVIT TO OBTAIN SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

FILE NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

08/18/2021: FILE NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • HearingEvent: ST-JOURNAL ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE COMBINED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLAIMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE COMBINED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLAIMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE LETTER FROM CHOCTAW NATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE OF PENDING SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT TO OBTAIN SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALKER, DANIEL