This case was last updated from Sequoyah County Courts on 03/21/2022 at 05:09:22 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: ROBERT RAY PARK, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 THE APPLICATION OF ROBERT RAY PARK, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Sequoyah County Courts, Sequoyah County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is WATERS, KYLE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0056

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Sequoyah, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

WATERS, KYLE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARK, ROBERT RAY

Defendant

CHRISTIE, NANNIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WALKER, DANIEL W

208 N Oak St

Sallisaw, OK 74955

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING

03/22/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING

AFFIDAVIT TO OBTAIM SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

03/22/2021: AFFIDAVIT TO OBTAIM SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF PUBLICATION

03/22/2021: NOTICE OF PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF PENDING SUIT

03/22/2021: NOTICE OF PENDING SUIT

EVIDENTIARY AFFIDAVIT OF BONDED ABSTRACTOR

03/22/2021: EVIDENTIARY AFFIDAVIT OF BONDED ABSTRACTOR

JOU8RNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

05/13/2021: JOU8RNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: JUDGMENT (COURT ORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOU8RNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COMBINED ENTRY OF APPREANCE AND DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LETTER FROM CHEROKEE NATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: EVIDENTIARY AFFIDAVIT OF BONDED ABSTRACTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF PENDING SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT TO OBTAIM SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRAIL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FILED ALL OTHER CIVIL ACTIONS; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less