This case was last updated from Stephens County Courts on 03/19/2022 at 23:16:07 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: RICKY I. RILEY, ET. AL., CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 THE APPLICATION OF RICKY I RILEY, , CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Stephens County Courts, Stephens County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is GRAHAM, KEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********034G

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Stephens, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

GRAHAM, KEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RILEY, RICKY I.

RILEY, CORIENE M.

Defendants

WILLIAMS, DORIS MARIE

PERKINS, DORIS MARIE

PERKINS, BRENDON JAMES

O'NEAL, ANGIE

THE UNKNOWN SUCCESSORS OF

PERKINS, BILLY JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

STONE LAW FIRM PLLC

Arvest Bank Building 729 W Main St, Suite 200

Duncan, OK 73533

 

Court Documents

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLAIMER EH

04/23/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLAIMER EH

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT KJG EH

05/13/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT KJG EH

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: ST:COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT KJG EH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLAIMER EH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLAIMER EH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS (B.PERKINS) RET TO ATTY SP; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS (A.O'NEAL) RET TO ATTY SP; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION EH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION AT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY PUBLICATION NOTICE AT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND - EFFECTIVE 1/1/05; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION AT; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less