This case was last updated from Creek County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 06:15:09 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY OF OK, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 06/22/2018 THE APPLICATION OF PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY OF OK, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as an Other - Injunction lawsuit. This case was filed in Creek County Courts, Creek County Courthouse - Sapulpa Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is GOLDEN, DOUGLAS W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0069

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • County, State:

    Creek, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

GOLDEN, DOUGLAS W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY OF OK

Defendants

HICKS, THOMAS

HICKS, GENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LEVINSON SMITH & HUFFMAN

Attorney at LEVINSON SMITH & HUFFMAN

1743 East 71St St

Tulsa, OK 74136

LEVINSON, LEE I.

1743 E. 71Th Street

Tulsa, OK 74136

DANIEL, JACOB R

Attorney at TAYLOR FOSTER MALLETT DOWNS RAMSEY & RUS

Po Box 309

Claremore, OK 74017

THETFORD, JOHN M

Attorney at LEVINSON SMITH & HUFFMAN PC

1743 E 71St St

Tulsa, OK 74136

BRENNAN, TERENCE P.

1743 East 71St St

Tulsa, OK 74136

MCLEMORE, EVAN M.

Attorney at LEVINSON SMITH & HUFFMAN PC

1743 E 71St St

Tulsa, OK 74136

 

Court Documents

FILE & ENTER PETITION

06/22/2018: FILE & ENTER PETITION

NOTICE OF HEARING PLAIN 'S PETITION FOR TEMPORARY

06/22/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING PLAIN 'S PETITION FOR TEMPORARY

ORDER FOR HEARING SET 7-11-18 AT 10:00 AM

06/22/2018: ORDER FOR HEARING SET 7-11-18 AT 10:00 AM

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THOMAS SIGNED ON 6-26-18

07/10/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THOMAS SIGNED ON 6-26-18

CM:DG:7-30-18:STRICKEN DISMISSAL FILED 7-27-18

07/31/2018: CM:DG:7-30-18:STRICKEN DISMISSAL FILED 7-27-18

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM:DG:7-30-18:STRICKEN DISMISSAL FILED 7-27-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • HearingEvent: DG:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED/SETTLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SE. CONTINUED TO 7-30-18 3:00 PM DUE TO ILLNESS OF THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM:DG:7-11-18:THOMAS & GENA HICKS APPEAR IN PERSON PRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLAIN 'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • HearingEvent: DG:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less