This case was last updated from Grady County Courts on 04/28/2022 at 10:14:20 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: NAME CHANGE, ET. AL., CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 THE APPLICATION OF NAME CHANGE, , CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Grady County Courts, Grady County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is LOWE, GINA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0079

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Grady, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

LOWE, GINA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

IN RE: NAME CHANGE

DUONG, CALEB VAN

PHAM, LINH TRIEU DIEM

DUONG, CLAIRE DAWN MINOR

 

Court Documents

CONSENT TO CHANGE OF NAME OF MINOR

05/24/2021: CONSENT TO CHANGE OF NAME OF MINOR

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

07/26/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

ORDER- 2CC

07/26/2021: ORDER- 2CC

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER- 2CC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING 7-26-21 @ 9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 4.11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.25

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND - EFFECTIVE 1-1-2005; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less