This case was last updated from Kingfisher County Courts on 05/11/2022 at 00:01:03 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: MIDSHIP PIPELINE COMPANY LLC, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 06/26/2018 THE APPLICATION OF MIDSHIP PIPELINE COMPANY LLC, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit. This case was filed in Kingfisher County Courts, Kingfisher County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0086

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Kingfisher, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDSHIP PIPELINE COMPANY LLC

Defendants

HUBBARD TRUSTEE, LOUISE MARIE

HUBBARD TRUST, LOUISE MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BOX, DAVID M

Williams Box Forshee Bullard, 522 Colcord Drive

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED/SETTLED (CJ,FD,SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • HearingEvent: TEMPORARY ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR ORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 6-30-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN SUMMONS - PERS SER - LOUISE MARIE HUBBARD -

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 7/1/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION - CIVIL (MISCELLEANOUS); Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less