This case was last updated from Craig County Courts on 05/10/2022 at 04:31:17 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: MELISSA ELLIS WHITING, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 THE APPLICATION OF MELISSA ELLIS WHITING, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit. This case was filed in Craig County Courts, Craig County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0094

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Craig, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITING, MELISSA ELLIS

Defendant

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LEE, JOSH D PC

Attorney at LEE, JOSH D PC

Po Box 352, 339 South Wilson

Vinita, OK 74301

CRUDUP, LAUREN

Lee Coats Law, Plc, Po Box 352

Vinita, OK 74301

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED MAILING FEE TO COURT CLERK FOR MAILING TO DPS

09/02/2021: CERTIFIED MAILING FEE TO COURT CLERK FOR MAILING TO DPS

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingEvent: SETTING FOR JUDGE GARDNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • HearingEvent: SETTING FOR JUDGE GARDNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: SETTING FOR JUDGE GARDNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: SETTING FOR JUDGE GARDNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE: 11-8-2021 @ 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN OF GREEN CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STAY OF REVOCATION AND ORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFIED MAILING FEE TO COURT CLERK FOR MAILING TO DPS; Amount: $ 15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFF 7/1/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRUDUP, LAUREN