This case was last updated from Haskell County Courts on 05/22/2022 at 09:18:07 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: MARLA ANN SUMPTER, ET. AL., CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 THE APPLICATION OF MARLA ANN SUMPTER, , CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Haskell County Courts, Haskell County Courthouse located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HENDERSON, BRIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0041

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Haskell, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HENDERSON, BRIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SUMPTER, MARLA ANN

TRUSTEE OF BAR S RANCH REVOCABLE TR

Defendants

FELLHAUER, JAY

JACKSON, W.F

FELLHAUER, RUTH

NASH, WILMA LAVAUGHN

DUNCAN, LESTER L.

STANTON, JUDITH LEE

CRAWFORD, PATTI JO

STANTON, JEFFREY BLAKE

STANTON, TODD ANDREW

NIEMACKL, KYLE ROBERT

NIEMACKLE, KURT WILLIAM

CREASON, MARTHA

MURPHY, HELEN DUNCAN

DUNCAN, RUSSELL JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BOVOS, MARC L.

Po Box 660

Poteau, OK 74953

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AS REQUESTED IN THE PLAIN 'S PETITION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, AND CONSENT TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WAIVER OF ISSUANCE AND SERVICE OF SUMMONS OR PROCESS,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY, ORDER AND DECREE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FILED (TREASURER)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FILED (ASSESSOR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FILED (BOCC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FILED (R SUMPTER)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CHSC FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PDLTF; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION (ALL OTHER CIVIL W/LTF); Amount: $ 85.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less