This case was last updated from McClain County Courts on 06/10/2022 at 07:11:21 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: LYNDELL DEAN MEEKS, ET. AL., CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 THE APPLICATION OF LYNDELL DEAN MEEKS, , CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in McClain County Courts, McClain County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is GRAY, CHARLES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0088

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    McClain, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

GRAY, CHARLES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MEEKS, LYNDELL DEAN

MEEKS, PHYLLIS

Defendants

UNK SUC OF ROBERT DEWEY KEEN

BARCUM, RHONDA

KEEN, IRENE

KEEN, MARY IRENE

KEEN, RONALD

KEEN, JIMMY

KEEN, TERRY

NEWCASTLE ESTATES HOMEOWNER'S ASSOC

KEEN BUILT INC.

FIRST AMERICA TITLE & TRUST CO

SOUTHWEST TITLE & TRUST CO INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HAXEL, TED W.

Po Box 367, 108 North 2Nd Street

Purcell, OK 73080

 

Court Documents

NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

06/08/2021: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

12/22/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS AND RET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPLICATION FOR ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: THIRD NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER TO ADD NECESSARY

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAXEL, TED W.