This case was last updated from McIntosh County Courts on 05/21/2022 at 07:10:24 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: LEE VUE, ET. AL., CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 THE APPLICATION OF LEE VUE, , CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in McIntosh County Courts, McIntosh County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HOGAN, MIKE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0073

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    McIntosh, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HOGAN, MIKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VUE, LEE

VUE, MEE

Defendants

TUCKER, JACK,KRISTIE TUCKER

THEIR HEIRS, SUCCESSORS,OR

ASSIGNS, IF ANY,AND THE SUCCESSORS

HEIRS, EXECUTORS,ADMINISTRATORS

TRUSTEES, DEVISEES,AND ASSIGNS

IMMEDIATE AND REMOTE, WHETHER

KNOWN OR UNKNOWN

OF GLEN ERNEST TUCKER, DECEASED

ASSIGNS, IF ANY, AND THE SUCCESSORS

TRUSTEES, DEVISEES, AND ASSIGNS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

JONES, ROBERT W

Po Box 1296

Owasso, OK 74055

 

Court Documents

FILE & ENTER PETITION

05/26/2021: FILE & ENTER PETITION

AFFIDAVIT TO OBTAIN SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

05/26/2021: AFFIDAVIT TO OBTAIN SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

PUBLICATION NOTICE

05/26/2021: PUBLICATION NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALIAS SUMMONS ORIGINAL RET'D SERVING JACK TUCKER BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (I.J. $135.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION COOKSON HILLS PUBLISHERS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISS. TO ATTY.; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISS. TO ATTY.; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CASE.-TT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFD KRISTIE TUCKER CALLED TO INQUIRE ABOUT THIS

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less