This case was last updated from Delaware County Courts on 04/21/2022 at 01:01:07 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: KEVIN ERNEST COLEMAN, ET. AL., CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 THE APPLICATION OF KEVIN ERNEST COLEMAN, , CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Property - Other Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Delaware County Courts, Delaware County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNEY, BARRY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0033

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Delaware, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DENNEY, BARRY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COLEMAN, KEVIN ERNEST

VIN# 1SL200R2XKG000273

1988 LAYTON CAMPER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LANKFORD, MORGAN

State Of Ok Ex Rel. Ok Tax Commission, P.O. Box 269056

Oklahoma City, OK 73126

 

Court Documents

PETITION

03/29/2021: PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PUBLICATION TO BE FILED; ORDER ISSUING TITLE IS GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: PETITIONER IS PRESENT AND PROVIDES AN AFFIDAVIT OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOMESTIC DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JE FINAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MORGAN LANKFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FOR THE OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER OF THE OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER OF SETTING - 5/21/21 AT 9:30

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGHTY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less