This case was last updated from Delaware County Courts on 05/22/2022 at 01:47:17 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: J.G. WENTWORTH ORGINATIONS, LLC, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 THE APPLICATION OF J G WENTWORTH ORGINATIONS, LLC, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Delaware County Courts, Delaware County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judges overseeing this case are CRUTCHFIELD, DAVID and DENNEY, BARRY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0121

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Delaware, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judges

CRUTCHFIELD, DAVID

DENNEY, BARRY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

J.G. WENTWORTH ORGINATIONS LLC

J.G. WENTWORTH ORGINATIONS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KORDUBA, LARYSSA

211 Florence Street

Tomball, TX 77375

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR TRANSFER OF SALE OF PARTIAL PAYMENT

07/27/2021: APPLICATION FOR TRANSFER OF SALE OF PARTIAL PAYMENT

ORDER SETTING HEARING - 8/27/21 AT 9:30

08/03/2021: ORDER SETTING HEARING - 8/27/21 AT 9:30

AFFIDAVIT OF R.B.

09/21/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF R.B.

SECOND AMENDED EXHIBIT 1

09/21/2021: SECOND AMENDED EXHIBIT 1

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOMESTIC DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JE FINAL ORDER OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SECOND AMENDED EXHIBIT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF R.B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 9/28/21 AT 9:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING ON FIRST AMENDED APPLICATION -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SALE OF PARTIAL PAYMENT RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLAIN 'S FIRST AMENDED APPLICATION FOR TRANSFER OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOMESTIC DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGHTY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPLICATION FOR TRANSFER OF SALE OF PARTIAL PAYMENT; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Korduba, Laryssa