This case was last updated from Atoka County Courts on 04/23/2022 at 06:19:34 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: JERRY D. WILLIAMS, ET. AL., CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 07/24/2018 THE APPLICATION OF JERRY D WILLIAMS, , CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Atoka County Courts, Atoka County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is INGE, PAULA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0024

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Atoka, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

INGE, PAULA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLIAMS, JERRY D.

WILLAIMS, SANDRA R.

Defendants

THE KNOWN AND UNKNOWN HEIRS

CHAPMAN JEWEL

LOVELACE, NITA

LOVELACE JR., ARCH

KIRBY, MARTHA NANCY

KIRBY, BILL

COPPEDGE, LAURA LEE

ADAMS, MARY EVELYN

IF LIVING AND IF DECEASED

MOSELEY, CAROL LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SCHAULAT, RONALD A.

Attorney at SCHAULAT - FALSETTI, PLLC

3800 N. Classen, Ste. C-110

Oklahoma City, OK 73118

SANDMANN, JOHNNY ATTY

28 North Main

Coalgate, OK 74538

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • HearingEvent: MOTION DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TUNC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER FOR HEARING PLAIN S' MOTION FOR ORDER NUNC PRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS WITH RETURN OF SERVICE - C.L.MOSELEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS WITH RETURN OF SERVICE - L.COPPEDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS REVOLVING FUND ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANDMANN, JOHNNY ATTY