This case was last updated from Okmulgee County Courts on 05/16/2022 at 08:32:11 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: JERRY CLARK, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 THE APPLICATION OF JERRY CLARK, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit. This case was filed in Okmulgee County Courts, Okmulgee County Courthouse - Okmulgee Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMIREZ, PANDEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0014

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Okmulgee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

RAMIREZ, PANDEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLARK, JERRY

Defendants

DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

STATE OF OKLAHOMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WELLS, JOSEPH R

320 South Boston Ave, Suite 1026

Tulsa, OK 74103

JOHNSON, KENDALL W.

320 South Boston Ave., Suite 1026

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

COURT MINUTE: RAMIREZ:: CONT BY AGREEMENT RESET FOR

05/11/2021: COURT MINUTE: RAMIREZ:: CONT BY AGREEMENT RESET FOR

DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGMENT OF TIME TO

09/22/2021: DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGMENT OF TIME TO

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: FINAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FINAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE RAMIREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE RAMIREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RECORDS NEEDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JULY 27TH, 2021 @ 10AM COUNSEL TO APPRAISE BAILIFF IF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE: RAMIREZ:: CONT BY AGREEMENT RESET FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE RAMIREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less