This case was last updated from McIntosh County Courts on 06/15/2022 at 07:36:54 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: JAKE ROWLAND, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 THE APPLICATION OF JAKE ROWLAND, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Property - Other Property lawsuit. This case was filed in McIntosh County Courts, McIntosh County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIDGES, BRENDON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0008

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    McIntosh, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BRIDGES, BRENDON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROWLAND, JAKE

Defendant

OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FRY, CHRISTOPHER G.

 

Court Documents

FILE & ENTER PETITION

01/20/2022: FILE & ENTER PETITION

ANSWER

03/11/2022: ANSWER

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • HearingEvent: TITLE ASSIGNING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • HearingEvent: JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BRIEF TESTIMONY GIVEN. COURT ENTERS JOURNAL ENTRY JUDG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM:(BRIDGES) TITLE ASSIGNG: PLTF. APPD, SWORN IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM:(BRIDGES) TITLE ASSIGNG: PLTF. APPD, SWORN IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (CHRISTOPHER FRY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 4.11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.25

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less