This case was last updated from Cherokee County Courts on 03/22/2022 at 22:21:40 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: INDIANA DAWN MARIE CRABTREE, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 THE APPLICATION OF INDIANA DAWN MARIE CRABTREE, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Cherokee County Courts, Cherokee County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judges overseeing this case are KIRKLEY, DOUG and KING, JOSHUA C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0010

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • County, State:

    Cherokee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judges

KIRKLEY, DOUG

KING, JOSHUA C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRABTREE, INDIANA DAWN MARIE

Defendant

IN RE THE NAME CHANGE

 

Court Documents

FILE & ENTER PETITION

01/21/2022: FILE & ENTER PETITION

NOTICE OF HRG 2-24-22 1:30

01/21/2022: NOTICE OF HRG 2-24-22 1:30

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • HearingEvent: KING PM DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • HearingEvent: KING PM DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 3.86

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.25

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less