This case was last updated from Osage County Courts on 06/25/2022 at 02:43:57 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: INDEPENDENT S PONCA CITY PUBLIC SCHOOLS CHOOL, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 THE APPLICATION OF INDEPENDENT S PONCA CITY PUBLIC SCHOOLS CHOOL, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Osage County Courts, Osage County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0069

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Osage, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PONCA CITY PUBLIC SCHOOLS, INDEPEND CHOOL

PONCA CITY PUBLIC SCHOOLS, INDEPENDENT CHOOL

PONCA CITY PUBLIC SCHOOLS, INDEPENDENT S CHOOL

Defendant

BRADDEN COMMUNITY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BRACKEN, GARY L

P O Box 2265

Ponca City, OK 74602

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

10/07/2021: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

NOTICE FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

10/07/2021: NOTICE FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

RELEASE OF ATTY'S LEIN

12/20/2021: RELEASE OF ATTY'S LEIN

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPLICATION FOR ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RELEASE OF ATTY'S LEIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRACKEN, GARY L.