This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 01/26/2023 at 14:03:34 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: IN THE MATTER OF, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 THE APPLICATION OF IN THE MATTER OF, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MCDANIEL, TRACY L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0118

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MCDANIEL, TRACY L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IN THE MATTER OF

Defendant

HOLCOMB, TAYLOR

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

08/09/2022: FILE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

FILE MOTHER'S COMBINED MOTION TO RECALL WRIT OF HABEAS

08/12/2022: FILE MOTHER'S COMBINED MOTION TO RECALL WRIT OF HABEAS

FILE MOTION TO WITHDRAW

08/22/2022: FILE MOTION TO WITHDRAW

FILE ORDER

08/23/2022: FILE ORDER

FILE ORDER TO PAY INTERPRETER

08/29/2022: FILE ORDER TO PAY INTERPRETER

 

Docket Entries

08/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER TO PAY INTERPRETER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION TO WITHDRAW

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022

HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CORPUS AND FOR EMERGENCY RELIEF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTHER'S COMBINED MOTION TO RECALL WRIT OF HABEAS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less