This case was last updated from Creek County Courts on 04/23/2022 at 05:51:06 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: FRANCES PATRICK, ET. AL., CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 THE APPLICATION OF FRANCES PATRICK, , CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Creek County Courts, Creek County Courthouse - Sapulpa Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is PARISH, LAWRENCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0053

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Creek, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

PARISH, LAWRENCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PATRICK, SCOTT

PATRICK, FRANCES

Defendants

ENGLE, DON

CREEK COUNTY TREASURER

CREEK COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

HELTON, VIRGINIA LEE

SPOUSE IF ANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GOFORTH, ANDREW

222 East Dewey, Ste., Sapulpa

SCOTT, DAVID R

2223 East 24Th St

Tulsa, OK 74114

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

04/09/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

JOINT ANSWER CREEK COUNTY TREASURER

04/12/2021: JOINT ANSWER CREEK COUNTY TREASURER

PROOF ON PUBLICATION: SAPULPA HERALD

06/07/2021: PROOF ON PUBLICATION: SAPULPA HERALD

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

06/17/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • HearingEvent: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF ON PUBLICATION: SAPULPA HERALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOINT ANSWER CREEK COUNTY TREASURER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 4.61

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.25

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOFORTH, ANDREW

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT, DAVID R (Bar #XX8016)