This case was last updated from Atoka County Courts on 04/23/2022 at 07:50:23 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: ESKON FRANK BUCHANAN, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 THE APPLICATION OF ESKON FRANK BUCHANAN, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Atoka County Courts, Atoka County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HARBUCK, PRESTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0018

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • County, State:

    Atoka, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HARBUCK, PRESTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUCHANAN, ESKON FRANK

 

Court Documents

FILE & ENTER PETITION

04/12/2021: FILE & ENTER PETITION

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CHANGE NAME

04/12/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CHANGE NAME

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

04/27/2020: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

ORDER

04/27/2021: ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: MOTION DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PER ORDER FILED INSTANTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE - GRANTS PETITION FOR NAME CHANGE, ALL AS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 4.11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.25

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS REVOLVING FUND ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less