This case was last updated from Sequoyah County Courts on 02/22/2022 at 04:48:41 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: DARYL STUART, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 THE APPLICATION OF DARYL STUART, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit. This case was filed in Sequoyah County Courts, Sequoyah County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is ORENDORFF, MATTHEW. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0004

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Sequoyah, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

ORENDORFF, MATTHEW

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STUART, DARYL

Defendant

STATE OF OK EX REL DPS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SCOUFOS LAW OFFICES

Attorney at SCOUFOS LAW OFFICES

P.O. Box 787

Sallisaw, OK 74955

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO VACATE DRIVER'S LICENSE REVOCATION FOR LACK

03/18/2021: MOTION TO VACATE DRIVER'S LICENSE REVOCATION FOR LACK

MINUTE ORDER

04/14/2021: MINUTE ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • HearingEvent: JUDGE ORENDORFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: JUDGE ORENDORFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: MO 3-7-22 AT 1PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • HearingEvent: JUDGE ORENDORFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: MO 12-13-21 AT 1PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • HearingEvent: JUDGE ORENDORFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MINUTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: MO 8-30-21 AT 1PM BY AGREEMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRAIL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FILED ALL OTHER CIVIL ACTIONS; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less