This case was last updated from Sequoyah County Courts on 04/23/2022 at 23:09:59 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: DALAN JAMES LEGG, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 THE APPLICATION OF DALAN JAMES LEGG, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit. This case was filed in Sequoyah County Courts, Sequoyah County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is ORENDORFF, MATTHEW. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0009

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Sequoyah, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

ORENDORFF, MATTHEW

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEGG, DALAN JAMES

Defendant

STATE OF OKLAHOMA EXREL. DEPAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SCOUFOS LAW OFFICES

Attorney at SCOUFOS LAW OFFICES

P.O. Box 787

Sallisaw, OK 74955

 

Court Documents

ORDER

01/19/2021: ORDER

COURT MINUTE

02/25/2021: COURT MINUTE

COURT MINUTE

05/17/2021: COURT MINUTE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SET ASIDE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MINUTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • HearingEvent: JUDGE ORENDORFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: MO PETITION SUSTAINED WITHOUT OBJECTION FROM DPS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • HearingEvent: JUDGE ORENDORFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: MO 7-19-21 AT 1PM, ATTORNEY SICK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • HearingEvent: JUDGE ORENDORFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • HearingEvent: JUDGE ORENDORFF

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRAIL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FILED ALL OTHER CIVIL ACTIONS; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less