This case was last updated from Woodward County Courts on 02/22/2022 at 15:51:10 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: CLARENCE DAVID HALL, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 THE APPLICATION OF CLARENCE DAVID HALL, CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Property - Other Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Woodward County Courts, Woodward County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLEY, ARIC A and KIRKSEY, ERIN N. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0003

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Woodward, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judges

ALLEY, ARIC A

KIRKSEY, ERIN N

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HALL, CLARENCE DAVID

Defendant

OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LANKFORD, MORGAN

Po Box 269056, Otc Legal Office, General Consel

Oklahoma City, OK 73126

 

Court Documents

PRO-SE AFFIDAVIT/ORDER PETITION FILED

01/15/2021: PRO-SE AFFIDAVIT/ORDER PETITION FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • HearingEvent: MOTION DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAXED A COPY OF THE JE TO OTC LEGAL OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE - JEJ GRANTED. ENK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • HearingEvent: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE-EFFECTIVE 7-1-04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PRO-SE AFFIDAVIT/ORDER PETITION FILED; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less