This case was last updated from Kay County Courts on 04/30/2022 at 16:46:29 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: BURKE'S WRECKER, ET. AL., CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 THE APPLICATION OF BURKE'S WRECKER, , CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Property - Other Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Kay County Courts, Kay County Courthouse - Newkirk Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is WILKIE, DAVID M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0009

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Kay, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

WILKIE, DAVID M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BURKE, LESTER C.

BURKE'S WRECKER

Defendant

OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FRY, CHRISTOPHER G.

Attorney at ASSISTANT GENERAL COUNSEL

P.O. Box 269056

Oklahoma City, OK 73126

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR COURT ORDER

01/21/2022: APPLICATION FOR COURT ORDER

ANSWER

03/11/2022: ANSWER

COURT ORDER

03/16/2022: COURT ORDER

AMENDED COURT ORDER

04/04/2022: AMENDED COURT ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AMENDED COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION DOCKET WILKIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPLICATION FOR COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less