This case was last updated from Atoka County Courts on 05/28/2022 at 04:18:14 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: ARRON J MATHISON, ET. AL., CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 THE APPLICATION OF ARRON J MATHISON, , CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Atoka County Courts, Atoka County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is INGE, PAULA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0051

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Atoka, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

INGE, PAULA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MATHISON, ARRON J

MATHISON, TIFFANY

Defendants

BARRETT, JANICE C. D. AKA JAN BARRE

DUVALL, JIMMIE L AKA JIMMIE LON DUV

DUVALL, JACKIE G AKA JACK DUVALL

WHITWELL, JUDY K AKA JUDY WHITWELL

INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS JOINT FIRST SU

THE JAMES R DUVALL AND

ETTIE JANE DUVALL REVOCABLE LIVING

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, EXECUTORS,ADMIN

PINE TELEPHONE COMPANY, INC AN OKLA

BARRETT, JANICE C. D. AKA JAN BARRETT

DUVALL, JIMMIE L AKA JIMMIE LON DUVALL A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

TUCKER, NICHOLAS R.

Attorney at REASOR LAW FIRM

P.O. Box 393

Atoka, OK 74525

REED, JAMES M. ATTY

Attorney at HALL,ESTILL,HARDWICK,GABLE,GOLDEN&NELSON

320 S Boston Ave, Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT TO OBTAIN SERVICE BY PUBLICATION AND DILIGENT

09/07/2021: AFFIDAVIT TO OBTAIN SERVICE BY PUBLICATION AND DILIGENT

NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

09/07/2021: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING

09/07/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING

ISSUE SUMMONS BACK TO ATTORNEY

09/07/2021: ISSUE SUMMONS BACK TO ATTORNEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND RESERVATION OF TIME TO RESPOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISCLAIMER OF JACK DUVALL, A/K/A JACKIE G. DUVALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISCLAIMER OF JUDY WHITWELL, A/K/A JUCY K. WHITWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISCLAIMER OF JANICE C.D. BARRETT, A/K/A JAN BARRETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: A/K/A JIMMIE L. DUVALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISCLAIMER OF JIMMIE DUVALL A/K/A JIMMIE LON DUVALL.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS REVOLVING FUND ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less