This case was last updated from Custer County Courts on 05/09/2022 at 07:54:26 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: AND, ET. AL., CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 THE APPLICATION OF AND, , CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Custer County Courts, Custer County Courts located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is WEEDON, JILL C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0014

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Custer, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

WEEDON, JILL C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

WALSH, JO FRANCES

AND

RICHARDS, SUE WALSH

Defendants

UNKNOWN HEIRS

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, DEVISEES

LEGATEES, SUCCESSORS AND

AND

ASSIGNS, IMMEDIATE & REMOTE

OF

HUGHES, FRANCIS G.

HUGHES, ALMA SCHUBERT

BARTON, MARION FRANCES HUGHES

WALSH, SUSANNAH GARNETT HUGHES

A/K/A

WALSH, SUSANNAH GARNETTE HUGHES

BARTON, ROSS M.

WALSH, EDMUND NELSON

WALSH, WILLIAM

HUGHES, WILLIAM ALEXANDER

HUGHES, SHEILA O.

GADDIS, SHEILA O.

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RADOVCIC, MICHAEL

Attorney at THE SCHROEDER GROUP

13900 N Portland Ave Suite 101

Oklahoma City, OK 73134

 

Court Documents

FILE AND ENTER PETITION

02/24/2021: FILE AND ENTER PETITION

NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED

02/24/2021: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING FIL & SCANNED

02/24/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING FIL & SCANNED

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FIL & SCANNED

04/27/2021: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FIL & SCANNED

PROOF OF PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED

04/27/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2021
  • HearingEvent: CIV TRACKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • HearingEvent: CIV TRACKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FIL & SCANNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FIL & SCANNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING FIL & SCANNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FIL & SCANNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less