This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 05/17/2023 at 02:41:08 (UTC).

Teresa D Manowski, Lloyd Manowski, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS OF JASMINE MANOWSKI, AMINOR Plaintiff, v. Cierra J. Attaway, AND GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY Defendant.

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 Teresa D Manowski, Lloyd Manowski, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PARENTS AND NEXT FRIENDS OF JASMINE MANOWSKI, AMINOR Plaintiff, filed an Other lawsuit against Cierra J Attaway, AND GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY Defendant. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Oklahoma, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Stinson, Sheila. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3900

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Stinson, Sheila

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Manowski, Lloyd

Manowski, Teresa D

Defendants

Attaway, Cierra J.

Geico Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIOTT, NICHOLAS A

Defendant Attorneys

Jones, Nicole R

Mckenney, Shanda

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

08/12/2022: ANSWER

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- SHANDA MCKENNEY AND NICOLE R JONES ATTONREY FOR DEF

08/12/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- SHANDA MCKENNEY AND NICOLE R JONES ATTONREY FOR DEF

PETITION

08/12/2022: PETITION

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/16/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/18/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

10/06/2022: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND RECEIPT OF FUNDS

10/06/2022: ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND RECEIPT OF FUNDS

ORDER TO DISMBURSE SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS

10/06/2022: ORDER TO DISMBURSE SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS

ORDER

10/06/2022: ORDER

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT WITH MINOR

10/06/2022: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT WITH MINOR

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • HearingEvent: PETITION; Docket: Sheila Stinson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - WITH PREJUDICE; Other; Party Details; Defendant: Geico Casualty Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - WITH PREJUDICE; Other; Party Details; Defendant: Attaway, Cierra J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT WITH MINOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER TO DISMBURSE SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RECP; Description: ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND RECEIPT OF FUNDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE STINSON: FRIENDLY SUIT, PLAIN PRESENT - GRANTED / SIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISPCVDMWP; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Count: 1; Party: Geico Casualty Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISPCVDMWP; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Count: 1; Party: Attaway, Cierra J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCode: SUIT; Description: FRIENDLY SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FRIENDLY SUIT(SUIT); Filed By: Manowski, Teresa D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less