This case was last updated from Garfield County Courts on 05/22/2022 at 09:28:31 (UTC).

TEOCALLI EXPLORATION, LLC, AN OKLAHOMA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, Plaintiff, v. AEXCO PETROLEUM, INC, A FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT BUSINESS CORPORATION, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 TEOCALLI EXPLORATION, LLC, AN OKLAHOMA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AEXCO PETROLEUM, INC, A FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT BUSINESS CORPORATION, Defendant. This case was filed in Garfield County Courts, Garfield County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Newby, Tom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-35

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Garfield, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Newby, Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEOCALLI EXPLORATION, LLC

Defendant

AEXCO PETROLEUM, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HENDERSON, J SCOTT

Attorney at BLANEY TWEEDY & TIPTON, PLLC

1250 City Place 204 N. Robinson Avenuse, P.O. Box 657

Oklahoma City, OK 73101

GANOTE, ANGELA W

P .O. Box 102

Concho, OK 73022

HARRIS, MIRANDA L

Attorney at BLANEY TWEEDY TIPTON & HIERSCHE, PLLC

1250 City Place 204 N Robinson Ave, Po Box 657

Oklahoma City, OK 73101

HIERSCHE, JUSTIN TANNER

Attorney at Blaney Tipton Hiersche and Odom PLLC

1250 City Place 204 N Robinson Ave, Po Box 657

Oklahoma City, OK 73101

Defendant Attorneys

SCHOVANEC, PHILIP A

Fellers Snider, 100 N. Broadway Suite 1700

Okc, OK 73102

PEPPER, DAVID E

100 N. Broadway, Ste 1700

Okc, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

PETITION

02/22/2021: PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

02/22/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE JUSTIN HIERSCHE FOR PLAIN

02/22/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE JUSTIN HIERSCHE FOR PLAIN

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE ANGELA GANOTE FOR PLAIN

02/22/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE ANGELA GANOTE FOR PLAIN

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE J. SCOTT HENDERSON OF PLAIN

02/22/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE J. SCOTT HENDERSON OF PLAIN

RETURN OF SERVICE

03/01/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE & RESERVATION OF TIME DAVID PEPPER AND PHILLIP SCHOVANEC FOR AEXCO

03/03/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE & RESERVATION OF TIME DAVID PEPPER AND PHILLIP SCHOVANEC FOR AEXCO

ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

04/05/2021: ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

PLAIN 'S ANSWER TO DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM

04/21/2021: PLAIN 'S ANSWER TO DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

05/03/2021: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

05/13/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE HEARING AND FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO RESPOND TP PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

05/14/2021: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE HEARING AND FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO RESPOND TP PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAIN TEOCALLI EXPLORATION, LLC

08/18/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAIN TEOCALLI EXPLORATION, LLC

ORDER

08/25/2021: ORDER

MOTION TO ENTER NON-JURY DOCKET

05/05/2022: MOTION TO ENTER NON-JURY DOCKET

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - MIRANDA HARRIS FOR PLAIN

05/05/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - MIRANDA HARRIS FOR PLAIN

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION TO ENTER; Docket: Tom Newby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - MIRANDA HARRIS FOR PLAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: MOTION TO ENTER NON-JURY DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAIN TEOCALLI EXPLORATION, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE HEARING AND FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO RESPOND TP PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-493965 ON 05/03/2021. PAYOR: RAYMOND H TIPTON III TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 50.00. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2021-35: $48.75 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CJ-2021-35: $1.25 ON AC09 CARD ALLOCATIONS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO THE FOLLOWING AGENCIES REDUCED BY THE FOLLOWING AMOUNTS:CJ-2021-35: AC01 CLERK FEES -$1.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCode: ADJUST; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO AC09-CARD ALLOCATION; Amount: $ 1.25

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Disposed: Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less