This case was last updated from Cleveland County Courts on 06/16/2022 at 04:09:16 (UTC).

Teddy Mcdade, Plaintiff, v. Tristan King, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 Teddy Mcdade, Plaintiff filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Tristan King, Defendant. This case was filed in Cleveland County Courts, Cleveland County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Tupper, Michael D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1158

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Cleveland, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Tupper, Michael D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mcdade, Teddy

Defendant

King, Tristan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALLAGHER, SCOTT

Attorney at LITTLE, OLIVER & GALLAGHER

One West Main

Ardmore, OK 73401

Defendant Attorney

MANNING, THOMAS P

Attorney at ANGELA D. ALLIES & ASSOCIATES

14000 Qual Springs Parkway Ste 230

Oklahoma City, OK 73134

 

Court Documents

PETITION

12/27/2021: PETITION

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / TRISTAN A. KING BY ATTORNEY THOMAS A. MANNING

01/20/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / TRISTAN A. KING BY ATTORNEY THOMAS A. MANNING

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT TRISTAN A. KING / BY ATTORNEY THOMAS A. MANNING

01/20/2022: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT TRISTAN A. KING / BY ATTORNEY THOMAS A. MANNING

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT TRISTAN A. KING / BY ATTORNEY THOMAS A. MANNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / TRISTAN A. KING BY ATTORNEY THOMAS A. MANNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: TRISTAN KING WITH KRISTIE KING 12-31-21; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: PSS / TRISTAN KING / LEFT COPY WITH KRISTIE KING (RESIDENT) / 12-31-21; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-1206877 ON 12/27/2021. PAYOR: LITTLE, OLIVER & GALLAGHER PLLC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 252.14. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2021-1158: $173.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CJ-2021-1158: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CJ-2021-1158: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2021-1158: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CJ-2021-1158: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2021-1158: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CJ-2021-1158: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CJ-2021-1158: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2021-1158: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2021-1158: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CJ-2021-1158: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. CJ-2021-1158: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE TUPPER, MICHAEL D TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCode: SMF; Description: SUMMONS FEE (CLERKS FEE); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCode: LTF; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCode: AUTONEG; Description: AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: AUTO NEGLIGENCE(AUTONEG); Disposed: Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALLAGHER, SCOTT