This case was last updated from Garfield County Courts on 02/23/2022 at 04:11:28 (UTC).

TD AUTO FINANCE, LLC Plaintiff, -vs- KRISTINE ANN DAVIS, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 TD AUTO FINANCE, LLC Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KRISTINE ANN DAVIS, Defendant. This case was filed in Garfield County Courts, Garfield County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Hladik, Dennis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-13

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Garfield, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Hladik, Dennis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD AUTO FINANCE

Defendant

DAVIS, KRISTINE ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUBBINS, JASON H

Po Box 10110

Columbia, MO 65205

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR MONEY DUE ON NOTE

01/21/2021: PETITION FOR MONEY DUE ON NOTE

SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

01/21/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL - KRISTINE DAVIS 2/8/21 CERT MAIL

04/26/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL - KRISTINE DAVIS 2/8/21 CERT MAIL

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

06/07/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

06/07/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL - SERVED KRISTINE DAVIS 2/8/21 CERT MAIL

06/07/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL - SERVED KRISTINE DAVIS 2/8/21 CERT MAIL

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL

06/07/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL

JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

06/07/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

07/12/2021: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CER; Description: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DEFAULT JUDGEMENT; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: DAVIS, KRISTINE ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JEDF; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: POS; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: POS; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL - SERVED KRISTINE DAVIS 2/8/21 CERT MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ANMS; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MODJ; Description: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCode: DISPCVDJ; Description: JE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Count: 1; Party: DAVIS, KRISTINE ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE HLADIK: BENCH DKT: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: POS; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL - KRISTINE DAVIS 2/8/21 CERT MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR MONEY DUE ON NOTE; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: TD AUTO FINANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUBBINS, JASON H