This case was last updated from Rogers County Courts on 05/03/2022 at 13:43:28 (UTC).

TD Auto Finance LLC, Plaintiff, v. James Cole, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 TD Auto Finance LLC, Plaintiff filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against James Cole, Defendant. This case was filed in Rogers County Courts, Rogers County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Condren, Sheila A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-116

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • County, State:

    Rogers, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Condren, Sheila A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD Auto Finance LLC

Defendant

Cole, James

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hudspeth, Matthew J.

Attorney at Baer and Timberlake PC

Po Box 18486

Oklahoma City, OK 73154

 

Court Documents

PETITION

04/22/2021: PETITION

PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

05/26/2021: PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

ORDER FOR HEARING

05/26/2021: ORDER FOR HEARING

SUMMONS RETURNED WITH AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ATTACHED, SERVED: JAMES COLE (PPS / 5-2-21)

05/27/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED WITH AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ATTACHED, SERVED: JAMES COLE (PPS / 5-2-21)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/02/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

06/30/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

06/30/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

JUDGE CONDREN: ATTY GINA KNIGHT PRESENT FOR PLTF. CASE COMES ON FOR MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFF'S SALE. HALLWAY SOUNDED THREE TIMES WITH NO RESPONSE. SALE CONFIRMED. ORDER SIGNED.

06/30/2021: JUDGE CONDREN: ATTY GINA KNIGHT PRESENT FOR PLTF. CASE COMES ON FOR MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFF'S SALE. HALLWAY SOUNDED THREE TIMES WITH NO RESPONSE. SALE CONFIRMED. ORDER SIGNED.

PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF ASSISTANCE

07/07/2021: PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF ASSISTANCE

WRIT OF ASSISTANCE ISSUED

07/07/2021: WRIT OF ASSISTANCE ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/07/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ROGERS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE RETURN OF SERVICE WITH WRIT OF ASSISTANCE ATTACHED (JAMES COLE - NOT SERVED AS HE CLAIMS THE VEHICLE HAS ALREADY BEEN REPO'D)

07/14/2021: ROGERS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE RETURN OF SERVICE WITH WRIT OF ASSISTANCE ATTACHED (JAMES COLE - NOT SERVED AS HE CLAIMS THE VEHICLE HAS ALREADY BEEN REPO'D)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: ROGERS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE RETURN OF SERVICE WITH WRIT OF ASSISTANCE ATTACHED (JAMES COLE - NOT SERVED AS HE CLAIMS THE VEHICLE HAS ALREADY BEEN REPO'D); Party: TD Auto Finance LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-645455 ON 07/07/2021. PAYOR: BAER & TIMBERLAKE, P.C. TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 126.64. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2021-116: $33.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CJ-2021-116: $50.00 ON AC08 SHERIFF FEES. CJ-2021-116: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2021-116: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CJ-2021-116: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2021-116: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CJ-2021-116: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2021-116: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2021-116: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CM; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: WAIS; Description: WRIT OF ASSISTANCE ISSUED; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN0155; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTION; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCode: REPLE; Description: REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: REPLEVIN(REPLE); Filed By: TD Auto Finance LLC

    Read MoreRead Less