This case was last updated from Logan County Courts on 03/23/2022 at 21:28:32 (UTC).

Taylor, Glenda E. v. Taylor, Michael D.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 Taylor, Glenda E filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Taylor, Michael D. This case was filed in Logan County Courts, Logan County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Duel, Louis A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-54

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Logan, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Duel, Louis A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Taylor, Glenda E.

Respondent

Taylor, Michael D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Brackett, Kevin C.

1315 N. Shartel Ave.

Okc, OK 73103

Respondent Attorney

Warner, Dale

2021 South Lewis Avenue, Suite 315

Tulsa, OK 74104

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

04/06/2021: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON MICHAEL TAYLOR

04/06/2021: SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON MICHAEL TAYLOR

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

04/06/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION RETURNED SERVED MICHAEL TAYLOR 4/5/21 BY PPS

04/07/2021: SUMMONS AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION RETURNED SERVED MICHAEL TAYLOR 4/5/21 BY PPS

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND RESERVATION OF TIME TO ANSWER

04/13/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND RESERVATION OF TIME TO ANSWER

ANSWER

05/17/2021: ANSWER

RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

05/17/2021: RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

AGREED DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

07/14/2021: AGREED DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DIVORCE GRANTED (DECREE OR ORDER); Judge; Party Details; Petitioner: Taylor, Glenda E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DDIV; Description: AGREED DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Party: Taylor, Glenda E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • HearingEvent: APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER; Party: Taylor,GlendaE.; Docket: Louis A Duel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE DUEL- BY AGREEMENT, CASE STRICKEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE DUEL- BY AGREEMENT. CASE IS RESET TO JULY 6, 2021 AT 9:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RESP; Description: RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: Temporary Order; Party: Taylor,GlendaE.; Docket: Louis A Duel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE DUEL- CASE IS RESET TO JUNE 1, 2021 AT 9:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND RESERVATION OF TIME TO ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 183.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCode: DIVWOMC; Description: DIVORCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: DIVORCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN(DIVWOMC); Filed By: Taylor, Glenda E.

    Read MoreRead Less