This case was last updated from Kingfisher County Courts on 11/20/2021 at 06:24:44 (UTC).

TARGET NATIONAL BANK, ET. AL. V. MARIA G RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 05/16/2018 TARGET NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARIA G RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Kingfisher County Courts, Kingfisher County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHNEITER, LANCE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0050

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kingfisher, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

SCHNEITER, LANCE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TD BANK USA NA

TARGET NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ, MARIA G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CASTRO, MICHAEL

445 E Fm 1382, Suite 3676

Cedar Hill, TX 75104

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED/SETTLED (CJ,FD,SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • HearingEvent: DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM - DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 5-30-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN SUMMONS - PERS SERVICE - MARIA G RODRIGUEZ -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUING 1 SUMMONS - TO ATTY; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 7/1/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION - CIVIL (CS UNDER 10,000); Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASTRO, MICHAEL