This case was last updated from Grady County Courts on 05/04/2022 at 06:58:25 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK V. PRAMESH PATEL

Case Summary

On 06/13/2018 SYNCHRONY BANK filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against PRAMESH PATEL. This case was filed in Grady County Courts, Grady County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BRAUER, TIMOTHY A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0444

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Grady, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BRAUER, TIMOTHY A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

PATEL, PRAMESH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CASTRO, MICHAEL

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL R. CASTRO, PLLC

445 E Fm 1382, Suite 3676

Cedar Hill, TX 75104

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED/SETTLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - LACK OF SERVICE 1-MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RET. ALIAS SUMMONS- NOT SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALIAS SUMMONS FEE TO ISSUE - PRAMESH PATEL; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS FEE TO ISSUE - PRAMESH PATEL; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND - EFFECTIVE 1-1-2005; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASTRO, MICHAEL