This case was last updated from Haskell County Courts on 05/04/2022 at 06:37:47 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK V. GLORIA GREEN

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 SYNCHRONY BANK filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against GLORIA GREEN. This case was filed in Haskell County Courts, Haskell County Courthouse located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HENDERSON, BRIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0080

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Haskell, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HENDERSON, BRIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

GREEN, GLORIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HOORFAR, CAMRON

202 Sw Market Street

Lee'S Summit, MO 64063

RAUSCH STURM LLP

Po Box 21690

Oklahoma City, OK 73156

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY

11/16/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • HearingEvent: DISP. DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTERED-TO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FOR THE PURPOSE OF STAT/REPORT;ST COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COMPUTER, BUT IS HAS BEEN FILED--TO)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: EMAIL; THE ORIGINAL IS NOT IN THE FILE OR ON THE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPY IS A FILE STAMPED COPY THE ATTORNEY HAS SENT IN BY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPY OF AGREED JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED (THIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PDLTF; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CHSC FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION CIVIL 10,000 OR LESS; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hoorfar, Camron