This case was last updated from Garfield County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 08:45:21 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK, Plaintiff, v. REBECCA J ALLEN, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 06/13/2018 SYNCHRONY BANK, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against REBECCA J ALLEN, Defendant. This case was filed in Garfield County Courts, Garfield County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Seigars, Jason. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-273

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Garfield, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Seigars, Jason

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

ALLEN, REBECCA J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOESE, KALEB

Attorney at RAUSCH STURM ISRAEL ENERSON & HORNIK LLP

5200 S Yale Avenue Suite 505

Tulsa, OK 74137

 

Court Documents

PETITION

06/13/2018: PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

06/13/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE REBECCA ALLEN ON 06-25-2018

07/06/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE REBECCA ALLEN ON 06-25-2018

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

10/17/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

10/21/2019: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

06/16/2021: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT BY FAMILY DOLLAR - UNABLE TO LOCATE EMPLOYEE UNDER PROVIDED NAME

08/10/2021: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT BY FAMILY DOLLAR - UNABLE TO LOCATE EMPLOYEE UNDER PROVIDED NAME

ORIGINAL GARNISHMENT SUMMONS - ANSWER FILED 8/10/21

08/10/2021: ORIGINAL GARNISHMENT SUMMONS - ANSWER FILED 8/10/21

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: GSS; Description: ORIGINAL GARNISHMENT SUMMONS - ANSWER FILED 8/10/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT BY FAMILY DOLLAR - UNABLE TO LOCATE EMPLOYEE UNDER PROVIDED NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-496925 ON 06/16/2021. PAYOR: EZ MESSENGER TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 116.64. LINE ITEMS: CS-2018-273: $73.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2018-273: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-273: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2018-273: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-273: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2018-273: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-273: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-273: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCode: GSIMA; Description: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN0155; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTION; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: SYNCHRONY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOESE, KALEB