This case was last updated from Comanche County Courts on 01/15/2022 at 07:15:58 (UTC).

Sylvester J. Wielgus, Plaintiff, and Lucinda S. Wielgus, Plaintiff, v. First Closing Company, Inc., Defendant.

Case Summary

On 06/19/2018 Sylvester J Wielgus, Plaintiff, and Lucinda S Wielgus, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against First Closing Company, Inc , Defendant. This case was filed in Comanche County Courts, Comanche County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Neuwirth, Gerald F.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-407

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Comanche, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Neuwirth, Gerald F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wielgus, Lucinda S

Wielgus, Sylvester J

Defendant

First Closing Company Inc

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: FINAL ORDER; Judge; Party Details

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: DISPFO; Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE / JUDGE NEUWIRTH; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE / JUDGE NEUWIRTH; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • HearingEvent: DISPOSITION HEARING DOCKET; Docket: Gerald F. Neuwirth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCode: NODD; Description: NOTICE OF DISPOSITION DOCKET TO: SYLVESTER AND LUCINDA WIELGUS SET 7-7-2021 @ 9:30AM; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCode: LT; Description: LETTER / SYLVESTER J. WIELGUS AND LUCINDA SUE WIELGUS; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-642026 ON 06/19/2018. PAYOR: WIELGUS/SYLVESTER TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 242.14. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2018-407: $168.71 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CJ-2018-407: $6.06 ON AC09 CARD ALLOCATIONS. CJ-2018-407: $5.85 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CJ-2018-407: $1.61 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2018-407: $4.87 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CJ-2018-407: $1.51 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2018-407: $6.82 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CJ-2018-407: $0.43 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CJ-2018-407: $2.41 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2018-407: $24.37 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2018-407: $9.75 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CJ-2018-407: $9.75 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO THE FOLLOWING AGENCIES REDUCED BY THE FOLLOWING AMOUNTS:CJ-2018-407: AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY -$0.25CJ-2018-407: AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND -$0.25CJ-2018-407: AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND -$0.63CJ-2018-407: AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND -$0.07CJ-2018-407: AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS -$0.02CJ-2018-407: AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY -$0.18CJ-2018-407: AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND -$0.04CJ-2018-407: AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES -$0.13CJ-2018-407: AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND -$0.05CJ-2018-407: AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL -$0.15CJ-2018-407: AC01 CLERK FEES -$4.29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCode: ADJUST; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO AC09-CARD ALLOCATION; Amount: $ 6.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE NEUWIRTH, GERALD F. TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCode: OTHER; Description: BREACH OF AGREEMENT - CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: BREACH OF AGREEMENT - CONTRACT(OTHER); Filed By: Wielgus, Sylvester J

    Read MoreRead Less