This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 06/26/2023 at 08:15:47 (UTC).

SUN LOANS V. ROOSEVELT WILSON DAVIS

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 SUN LOANS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROOSEVELT WILSON DAVIS. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CAWTHON, J. DAVID. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0054

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CAWTHON, J. DAVID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUN LOANS

Defendant

DAVIS, ROOSEVELT WILSON

 

Court Documents

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM & ISSUE ORDER

01/12/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM & ISSUE ORDER

FILE PROOF OF SERVICE TO DAVIS ROOSEVELT ON 1-17-23 $45

01/26/2023: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE TO DAVIS ROOSEVELT ON 1-17-23 $45

FILE JOURNAL ENTRY:

02/08/2023: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY:

 

Docket Entries

02/08/2023

HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023

HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 9.50% INTEREST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: $1605.23 PLUS COURT COST, PROCESS SERVER FEE, AND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLAIN APPEARED, DEF NOT; JUDGMENT FOR PLAIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE TO DAVIS ROOSEVELT ON 1-17-23 $45

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

HearingEvent: DEFENDANT SERVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

HearingEvent: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEARING SET FOR 2-8-23 AT 9:00 AM SPS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM & ISSUE ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less