This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 07/20/2023 at 06:27:33 (UTC).

SUN LOANS V. KEITH SCOBEY JR

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 SUN LOANS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KEITH SCOBEY JR. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CAWTHON, J. DAVID. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0056

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CAWTHON, J. DAVID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUN LOANS

Defendant

SCOBEY, KEITH JR

 

Court Documents

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM & ISSUE ORDER

01/12/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM & ISSUE ORDER

FILE PROOF OF SERVICE TO KEITH SCOBEY JR ON 1-17-23 $45

01/26/2023: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE TO KEITH SCOBEY JR ON 1-17-23 $45

FILE JOURNAL ENTRY:

02/08/2023: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY:

FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT -BISON METAL TECHNOLOGIES

05/08/2023: FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT -BISON METAL TECHNOLOGIES

FILE RETURN RECEIPT TO BISON METAL TECHNOLOGIES SINGED

05/16/2023: FILE RETURN RECEIPT TO BISON METAL TECHNOLOGIES SINGED

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER - NOTHING WITHHELD DUE TO PRIOR

05/26/2023: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER - NOTHING WITHHELD DUE TO PRIOR

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER $0

06/14/2023: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER $0

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER $0

06/22/2023: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER $0

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER $0

07/17/2023: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER $0

 

Docket Entries

07/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER $0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER $0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER $0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER - NOTHING WITHHELD DUE TO PRIOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BY CLARICE EDWARDS ON 5-11-23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN RECEIPT TO BISON METAL TECHNOLOGIES SINGED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
02/08/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLAIN APPEARED, DEF NOT; JUDGMENT FOR PLAIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE TO KEITH SCOBEY JR ON 1-17-23 $45

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

HearingEvent: DEFENDANT SERVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

HearingEvent: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEARING SET FOR 2-8-23 AT 9:00 AM SPS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM & ISSUE ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less