This case was last updated from Craig County Courts on 05/03/2022 at 13:39:57 (UTC).

SUN LOAN COMPANY V. DANIEL TURNBOUGH

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 SUN LOAN COMPANY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DANIEL TURNBOUGH. This case was filed in Craig County Courts, Craig County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CROSSON, HONORABLE TERRELL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0035

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Craig, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CROSSON, HONORABLE TERRELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUN LOAN COMPANY

Defendant

TURNBOUGH, DANIEL

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE.. SERVED 3-12-2021 $35

03/12/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE.. SERVED 3-12-2021 $35

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2026
  • HearingEvent: DISPOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RECEPTACLE/UNABLE TO FORWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN OF GREENCARD- RETURN TO SENDER, NO MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SERVICE FEES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF PLAIN FOR $1,468.30 WHICH INCLUDES COST AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEF FTA. DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN THE NEW AMOUNT BY REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: NO CR: JUDGE GARDER PRESIDING. PLAIN PRESENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE.. SERVED 3-12-2021 $35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT & ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less