This case was last updated from Cherokee County Courts on 03/24/2022 at 01:12:02 (UTC).

SUN LOAN COMPANY V. ANDREW DOUGHTY

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 SUN LOAN COMPANY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANDREW DOUGHTY. This case was filed in Cherokee County Courts, Cherokee County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HUGGINS, GARY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0142

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Cherokee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HUGGINS, GARY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUN LOAN COMPANY

Defendant

DOUGHTY, ANDREW

 

Court Documents

ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER DIRECT

04/07/2021: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER DIRECT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE SUMMONS ISSUED CERT MAIL BY CCLERK; Amount: $ 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 63.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER DIRECT; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less