This case was last updated from Texas County Courts on 05/10/2022 at 22:24:21 (UTC).

SUN LOAN COMPANY, ET. AL. V. BRANDON GARY ROMERO

Case Summary

On 05/17/2018 SUN LOAN COMPANY filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRANDON GARY ROMERO. This case was filed in Texas County Courts, Texas County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is JETT, A. CLARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0090

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Texas, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

JETT, A. CLARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TLB SUN LOAN CO.OK #2 INC.

DBA

SUN LOAN COMPANY

Defendant

ROMERO, BRANDON GARY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CC MEMO: MAILED COPY TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ARTICLE #: 7017 2620 0000 8888 2254

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SIGNED BY: K. WATSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED MAIL - DATED: 6/21/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ARTICLE #: 7017 2620 0000 8888 2254

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MAILING FEE FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPY FEE FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 6.50% FROM TODAY AND COURT COSTS OF $108.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TAKEN. JUDGMENT FOR PLTF FOR $1,186.69, STAT INT @

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLTF APPEARS. DEFT FOUND IN DEFAULT. SWORN TESTIMONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER SERVED & RETURNED: 5/23/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SHERIFF FEE; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED TO SHERIFF; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less