This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 05/13/2022 at 01:29:40 (UTC).

SUN LOAN AND TAX SERVICE V. VERONICA WERDEHOFF

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 SUN LOAN AND TAX SERVICE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VERONICA WERDEHOFF. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HALL, RAFE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0158

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HALL, RAFE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUN LOAN AND TAX SERVICE

Defendant

WERDEHOFF, VERONICA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS - CERT. MAIL TO GAULT FOUNDATION; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE CONTINUING POST JUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 63.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • HearingEvent: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WERDEHOFF 07/20/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURNED APPLICATION WITH ORDER - SERVED VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUED APPLICATION WITH ORDER - TAKEN FOR SERVICE; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less