This case was last updated from Custer County Courts on 04/09/2022 at 19:12:10 (UTC).

STEVIE VAUGHN JOHNSON V. SANDRA COLMORE

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 STEVIE VAUGHN JOHNSON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SANDRA COLMORE. This case was filed in Custer County Courts, Custer County Courts located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is JONES, STEPHANIE C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0001

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Custer, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

JONES, STEPHANIE C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON, STEVIE VAUGHN

Defendant

COLMORE, SANDRA

 

Court Documents

CM: SCJ

01/13/2021: CM: SCJ

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • HearingEvent: CS-TRACKING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED/SETTLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO PROSECUTE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PARTIES FAIL TO APPEAR. CASE IS DISMISSED FOR FAILURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: SCJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BY ERIC DOMINGEZ CUSTER CO SO 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ROOMMATE JAYDEN MARTIN AT 524 S 8TH CLINTON, CUSTER CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEF SERVED ON 01/10/2021 BY LEAVING A COPY WITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER SERVED AND RETURNED; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED TO SHERIFF TO SERVE:; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less