This case was last updated from Delaware County Courts on 05/16/2022 at 06:42:14 (UTC).

STEPHEN BELL, ET. AL. V. GARY LOPEZ, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 STEPHEN BELL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GARY LOPEZ. This case was filed in Delaware County Courts, Delaware County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CRUTCHFIELD, DAVID. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0131

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Delaware, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CRUTCHFIELD, DAVID

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BELL, STEPHEN

BELL, TAMMI

Defendants

LOPEZ, GARY

ALVARADO, GRAVIELA

 

Court Documents

FILE AND ENTER AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS

03/23/2021: FILE AND ENTER AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

03/23/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

ORDER AND RETURN - DEFENDANT GAVIYAEL ALVARADO

03/26/2021: ORDER AND RETURN - DEFENDANT GAVIYAEL ALVARADO

CM: MATTER COMES BEFORE THE COURT ON THE SMALL CLAIMS

04/05/2021: CM: MATTER COMES BEFORE THE COURT ON THE SMALL CLAIMS

JE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

04/05/2021: JE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

CM: HEARING STRICKEN

04/16/2021: CM: HEARING STRICKEN

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOMESTIC DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: HEARING STRICKEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MAILED COPY TO PLAIN AND DEFENDANT; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DOMESTIC DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF THE PLAIN ; CASE SET FOR REVIEW 4/16/21 ON 9:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LOPEZ FAILS TO APPEAR; COURT GRANTS JUDGMENT IN FAVOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GRAVIELA ALVARADO PRESENT IN PERSON; DEFENDANT GARY

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DOCKET; PLAIN STEPHEN BELL PRESENT IN PERSON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: MATTER COMES BEFORE THE COURT ON THE SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFENDANT GARY CHACON LOPEZ; FEE $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PERSONALLY SERVED 2/24/21 BY DCSO; COPIES LEFT FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER AND RETURN - DEFENDANT GAVIYAEL ALVARADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUING ORDER TO DCSO FOR SERVICE; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less