This case was last updated from Murray County Courts on 06/09/2022 at 14:39:55 (UTC).

STATE OF OKLAHOMA; TAX COMMISS V. GEORGE HANSEN

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 STATE OF OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISS filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against GEORGE HANSEN. This case was filed in Murray County Courts, Murray County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DUCK, AARON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0009

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Murray, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DUCK, AARON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF OKLAHOMA; TAX COMMISS

Defendant

HANSEN, GEORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MCGLASSON, SCOTT

Po Box 950391

Oklahoma City, OK 73195

 

Court Documents

COURT ORDER: THIS MATTER COMES ON DEFENDANT'S REQUEST

05/17/2021: COURT ORDER: THIS MATTER COMES ON DEFENDANT'S REQUEST

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARINSHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGHTY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less