This case was last updated from Marshall County Courts on 05/20/2022 at 07:52:34 (UTC).

STATE OF OKLAHOMA OTC V. WILLIAM JAY CANTRELL

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 STATE OF OKLAHOMA OTC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against WILLIAM JAY CANTRELL. This case was filed in Marshall County Courts, Marshall County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is COPPEDGE, WALLACE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0007

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Marshall, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

COPPEDGE, WALLACE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF OKLAHOMA OTC

Defendant

CANTRELL, WILLIAM JAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MCGLASSON, SCOTT

Attorney at LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON

P. O. Box 950391

Oklahoma City, OK 73195

PAUL, ELIZABETH

P.O. Box 950391

Oklahoma City, OK 73195

 

Court Documents

FILE AND ENTER PETITION

01/20/2022: FILE AND ENTER PETITION

CONTINUING POST-JUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT SUMMONS

04/01/2022: CONTINUING POST-JUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CALCULATION FOR CONTINUING GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CALCULATION FOR CONTINUING GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CALCULATION FOR CONTINUING GARNISHMENT OF EARNINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUING POST-JUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: IBTA FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUING POST-JUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAUL, ELIZABETH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCGLASSON, SCOTT