This case was last updated from Pushmataha County Courts on 05/16/2022 at 07:23:42 (UTC).

State Of Oklahoma, Ex Rel Oklahoma Tax Commission, Plaintiff, v. Zack Williams, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 State Of Oklahoma, Ex Rel Oklahoma Tax Commission, Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Zack Williams, Defendant. This case was filed in Pushmataha County Courts, Pushmataha County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DeBerry, Michael D.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****21-9

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pushmataha, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DeBerry, Michael D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of Oklahoma, Ex Rel Oklahoma Tax Commission

Defendant

Williams, Zack

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul, Elizabeth

Attorney at LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON, LLP

P.O. Box 950391

Oklahoma City, OK 73195

 

Court Documents

CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.

02/26/2021: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

04/19/2021: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

WITHDRAWL OF GARNISHMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

07/22/2021: WITHDRAWL OF GARNISHMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

RETURN OF SERVICE TO US DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE

02/17/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE TO US DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE

CASE IS HERBY CLOSED DUE TO THE PETITIONER HAS FILE THEIR WITHDRAWL OF GARNISHMENT ON 7-22-21.

03/15/2022: CASE IS HERBY CLOSED DUE TO THE PETITIONER HAS FILE THEIR WITHDRAWL OF GARNISHMENT ON 7-22-21.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: OTHER; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: Williams, Zack

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: CASE IS HERBY CLOSED DUE TO THE PETITIONER HAS FILE THEIR WITHDRAWL OF GARNISHMENT ON 7-22-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE TO US DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WITHDRAWL OF GARNISHMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN0155; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTION; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCode: OTHER; Description: OTHER <..description action..="" of="">

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: OTHER <..description action..="" of="">(OTHER); Filed By: State Of Oklahoma, Ex Rel Oklahoma Tax Commission

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAUL, ELIZABETH