This case was last updated from Choctaw County Courts on 05/24/2022 at 03:05:49 (UTC).

STANLEY JAY MCKEE V. JAMES MAYO

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 STANLEY JAY MCKEE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JAMES MAYO. This case was filed in Choctaw County Courts, Choctaw County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BAZE, BILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0146

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Choctaw, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BAZE, BILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCKEE, STANLEY JAY

Defendant

MAYO, JAMES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER (Civil,Divorce,S.C.,Adop.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: REPLEVIN. THE COURT FINDS IN FAVOR OF THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER: BOTH PARTIES PRESENT, MATTER COMES ON FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER AND COUNTER CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 2.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -1.24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -1.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUED TO SO FOR SERVICE; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT/ORDER TO:; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less