This case was last updated from Haskell County Courts on 06/04/2022 at 02:35:44 (UTC).

STACY LYNETTE SEABOLT V. UNITED PARTNERS HEALTH CARE INC., ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2018 STACY LYNETTE SEABOLT filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against UNITED PARTNERS HEALTH CARE INC ,. This case was filed in Haskell County Courts, Haskell County Courthouse located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HENDERSON, BRIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0085

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Haskell, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HENDERSON, BRIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEABOLT, STACY LYNETTE

Defendants

UNITED PARTNERS HEALTH CARE INC.

AND/OR CHERYL WILSON OWNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GASSAWAY, B. RYAN

530 Court Street

Muskogee, OK 74401

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ST CODE ENTERED FOR STAT PURPOSES--TO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFAULT ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • HearingEvent: DISP. DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CHSC FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PDLTF; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION FOR CIVIL 10,000 OR MORE; Amount: $ 163.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less